Vedic multiplication is a quick and efficient way to multiply large numbers faster and easily. In vedic maths, multiplication is done using two methods: –

**Nikhilam method (base method method)****Urdhva tiryak (cross multiply method)**

**1. Nikhilam Sutra:**

This is the most simple trick to multiply numbers using Vedic Mathematics. Using Nikhilam Sutra it is simpler to multiply numbers like 98 & 95, 997 & 987, 102 & 112, 995 & 1008 i.e. the numbers which are closer to power of 10. This Sutra is a Specific method of Multiplication in Vedic Mathematics which shows shortcuts to multiply numbers which are closer to power of 10 (10, 100, 1000, etc.)

let us take an example: –

Multiply **93 * 98**

** Step By Step Explanation:**

**STEP 1 =** Take the algebraic sum of digits across any crosswise – pair. e.g. 93 + (-2) or 98 + (-7). Both give the same result which is 91, which is our first part of the answer.

93 * 98 = 91 _ _

**STEP 2 =** Now, just multiply the two differences (–2) × (–7) to get 14, which is the second part of the answer.

**STEP 3 =** The final answer is **9114**, (9100 + 14).

*To Be Note = Since our base is 100, we should have two digits in the second or final part of the answer.*

**2. Urdhva Tiryak Sutra:**

This is another great shortcut method of multiplication using Vedic Mathematics. Urdhva Tiryak is the General method of multiplication in Vedic Maths which provides a shortcut to multiply any type of numbers. It can be applied very easily to multiply 3 digit numbers, multiply 4 digits numbers and even more than 4 digit number

let us take an example: –

** ** **32*21**

3*2 = 6(multiply the highest digits)

32*21 = 6 _ _ (first digit)

3*1 + 2*2 = 3 + 4 =7 (cross multiply and adding together)

32*21 = 67_ (middle digit)

2*1=2 (multiply the lowest digits)

32*21 = 672(last digit)

Answer is** 672**