Home » Question » What are some of the best vedic math tricks?
What are some of the best vedic math tricks?

What are some of the best vedic math tricks?

There are several Vedic Math tricks, you don’t need to depend on calculators for any big calculations. These Vedic Math Tricks prove to be really helpful to crack any competitive exams. So here are the 8 Vedic Math tricks that: –

1. Squaring Of A Number Whose Unit Digit Is 5

For example Find (55) ² =?

Step 1. 55 x 55 = . . 25 (end terms)
Step 2. 5x (5+1) = 30

So our answer will be 3025.

2. Multiply a Number By 5

Take any number, and depending on its even or odd nature, divide the number by 2 (get half of the number).

Even Number:

2464 x 5 =?
Step 1. 2464 / 2 = 1232
Step 2. add 0
The answer will be 2464 x 5 = 12320

Odd Number:

3775 x 5
Step 1. Odd number; so ( 3775 – 1) / 2 = 1887
Step 2. As it is an odd number, so instead of 0 we will put 5
The answer will be 3775 x 5 = 18875

3. Subtraction From 1000, 10000, 100000

For example:
1000 – 573 =? (Subtraction from 1000)

We simply subtract each figure in 573 from 9 and then subtract the last figure from 10.
Step 1. 9 – 5 = 4
Step 2. 9 – 7 = 2
Step 3. 10 – 3 = 7

So, the answer is: (1000 – 573) = 427

4. Multiplication Of Any 2-digit Numbers (11 – 19)

There are 4 steps to get the result:

Step 1. Add the unit digit of the smaller number to the larger number.
Step 2. Next, multiply the result by 10.
Step 3. Now, multiply the unit digits of both the 2-digit numbers.
Step 4. Then add both the numbers.

For example: Let’s take two numbers 13 & 15.
Step 1. 15 + 3 =18.
Step 2. 18*10 = 180.
Step 3. 3*5 = 15
Step 4. Add the two numbers, 180+15 and the answer is 195.

5. Dividing A Large Number By 5

1st step. Multiply the number by 2
2nd step: Move the decimal point to the left.
3rd step: Left side of the decimal point is your answer.

For example: 245 / 5 =?
Step 1. 245 * 2 = 490
Step 2. Move the decimal: 49.0

6. Multiply Any Two-digit Number By 11

For example:

32 x 11

32 * 11 = 3 (3+2) 2 = 352
So, the answer is: 32 * 11 =352

7. Multiplication Of Any 3-digit Numbers

Suppose you want to multiply these 2 numbers: 306 and 308

Step 1. Now subtract the unit place digit from the actual number.
308-8=300
306-6=300

Step 2. Now select any (1st or 2nd) number and add the unit digit of the other number
308+6=314

Step 3. Now we will multiply the product we got in step 2 and step 1; 314×300 = 94200

Step 4. Unit digits of both the numbers are 8 & 6. The product of these 2 numbers: 8×6=48

Step 5. Last step: 94200 + 48 = 94248

So our final answer 306 x 308 = 306 is 94248

8. Find The Square Value

Finding the square of a number in using Vedic Maths Trick is easy. Just follow the below steps:

Step 1.Choose a base closer to the original number.
Step 2. Find the difference of the number from the base.
Step 3. Add the difference with the original number.
Step 4. Multiply the result with the base.
Step 5. Add the product of the square of the difference with the result of the above point.

(99) ² =?
Step 1. Choose 100 as base
Step 2. Difference: 99-100 = -1
Step 3. Add the number with the difference that you got in Step 2 = 99 + (-1) = 98
Step 4. Multiplying result with base = 98*100 = 9800
Step 5. Now, add result with the square of the difference= 9800 + (-1)² = 9801
So our answer is : (99) ² = 9801

Leave a Reply

Your email address will not be published.

Download the Vedic Maths Syllabus

Lets Chat!
Need Help🤝?
Hello 👋 ;
How Can I Help You?